Case Information: 55186 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBERSON (LAVELL) VS. STATE C/W 55115 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 55115 *, 55186 | Related Case(s): | 51293 , 55115 , 58572 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C238973 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-00127 | |
01/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgment of the district court in Docket No. 55115 AFFIRMED AND we ORDER the judgment of the district court in Docket No. 55186 REVERSED and we REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP10-MC/NS/MG Nos. 55115/55186. | 10-14815 | |
07/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15905 | |
07/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. | 10-15905 |