judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DECASTRO (CASTRO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 55184
Short Caption:DECASTRO (CASTRO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 62870
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C227956 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/13/2011 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/13/2011How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/04/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 10-00124
01/04/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/22/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Request for Rough Draft Transcript Pursuant to NRAP 3C(d)(3). 10-01902
01/28/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-02501
02/02/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for extension of time to file the fast track statement as moot. Opening brief is due May 4, 2010. Docketing state due 10 days (docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 10-02805
02/08/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/29/09, 08/26/09, 09/01/09, 09/02/09, 09/03/09, and 09/04/09. 10-03575
02/11/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Counsel's Emergency Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Docketing Statement 10-03756
02/11/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Docketing Statemant due 2/23/10. 10-03823
02/22/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-04781
05/03/2010MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 3, 2010. 10-11323
06/03/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief 10-14326
06/07/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 2, 2010. 10-14515
08/02/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Permission to Exceed Page Limit - NRAP 32(a)(7). 10-19934
08/04/2010MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Opening Brief. Granted: 40 pages. 10-20171
08/04/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-20172
08/04/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1-3. 10-20173
08/09/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Appellant's Opening Brief. 10-20501
08/17/2010AppendixReceived CD-ROM for Appendix. Appendix to Opening Brief Vols 1-3 filed on 8/4/10. (10-20173)
09/01/2010MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time-Answering Brief. 10-22449
09/01/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: October 1, 2010. 10-22450
10/01/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). (7) days. 10-25493
10/04/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: October 8, 2010. 10-25685
10/08/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief Respondent's Answering Brief 10-26406
10/08/2010MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages Motion for Leave to File 40 Page Answering Brief 10-26398
10/08/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion for Excess Pages Approved 40 pages granted - Answering Brief. 10-26400
11/22/2010MotionFiled Motion to Excuse Late Filing of Appellant's Reply Brief. 10-30440
11/23/2010Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/23/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for extension of time to file the reply brief. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on November 22, 2010. Briefing of this appeal is now complete. 10-30651
11/23/2010BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. 10-30652
01/21/2011Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/30/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 11-09572
04/27/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for June 15, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP 11-12440
06/01/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 11-16087
06/09/2011MotionFiled Emergency Motion to Vacate and Reset Oral Argument. - 11-17034
06/09/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for June 15, 2011, at 10:00 a.m., and direct the clerk of this court to schedule this appeal for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 11-17067
10/10/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 13, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP 11-30990
11/29/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 11-36604
12/07/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Counsel for the Purposes of Oral Argument. 11-37401
12/13/2011Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP
02/24/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 12-06012
03/20/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-08791
03/20/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
03/30/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 26, 2012. 12-08791