Case Information: 55175 | |||
Short Caption: | SANCHEZ VS. PILCHER (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D414162 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/06/2010 / Schofield, Paul | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/30/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-31599 | |
12/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/30/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-31600 | |
01/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Cover Sheet. (SEALED) | 10-00231 | |
01/06/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul H. Schofield | 10-00316 | |
01/22/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/24/10. | 10-01847 | |
01/28/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-02511 | |
02/04/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Lucien Cravens check no. 2443. | ||
02/05/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-03410 | |
02/26/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-05198 | |
03/10/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 10 days to request transcripts; 40 days to file and serve fast track statement and appendix. NRAP3E(c)(2). | 10-06333 | |
03/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 10-07764 | |
04/02/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Having reviewed the stipulation of the parties filed on March 24, 2010, the stipulation is approved and " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed." The parties shall bear their own attorney fees. SNP10-TL | 10-08679 | |
04/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |