judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAMS (DANIEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53373
Short Caption:ADAMS (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 60136 , 64402
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C245166 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/05/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/06/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 09-05844
03/06/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. 09-05847
03/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanctions of $500 due: 15 days, or Request for Rough Draft Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. 09-07935
04/07/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/08/08 through 12/12/08. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. Filed in district court on: 4/01/09. 09-08681
04/14/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-09428
04/21/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due May 15, 2009. 09-09903
05/05/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/10/08, 12/11/08, and 12/12/08. 09-11144
05/22/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-12817
05/22/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 09-12819
06/03/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 10 days (17 pages). 09-13885
06/09/2009Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 09-14341
06/09/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 09-14342
06/10/2009Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 09-14478
07/02/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Full Briefing. Opening brief due 30 days. 09-16393
07/09/2009MotionFiled Motion. Expedited Decision Requested. 09-16974
07/14/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney Dustin R. Marcello shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file proof of service of the motion to withdraw on appellant. 09-17293
07/17/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Motion to Withdraw as Appellate Counsel. 09-17633
07/24/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion and Remanding for Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove attorneys Osvaldo Fumo and Dustin Marcello as counsel of record for appellant. District Court Order apppointing counsel due: 35 days. Briefing is suspended. 09-18234
08/27/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Cynthia Dustin, Esq. 09-20935
09/04/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes. Appointing Appellate Counsel Cynthia Dustin. 09-21606
09/14/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Reinstating Briefing. We direct the clerk of this court to file the opposition received on July 27, 2009. We decline to reconsider our prior order allowing trial counsel to withdraw, but we again remind trial counsel of their obligation under NRAP 3C(b) to cooperate fully with appellate counsel during this appeal. The district court has appointed attorney Cynthia L. Dustin as appellate counsel in this matter and Ms. Dustin filed a notice of appearance as appellate counsel on August 27, 2009. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. 09-22208
09/14/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Objection to Appellate's Counsel Motion to Withdraw. 09-18289
12/14/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (2) days. 09-30216
12/14/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: December 16, 2009. 09-30217
12/16/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-30560
12/22/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 09-31038
01/14/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. 10-01218
01/14/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: February 16, 2010. 10-01225
02/16/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-04115
02/16/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 10-04116
03/15/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-06817
04/05/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 10-08706
04/05/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/21/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP 10-16118
07/16/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-17078
07/16/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 22, 2010. 10-17078