Case Information: 53368 | |||
Short Caption: | RUFFIN, JR. (GISTARVE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37666 , 49231 , 49674 , 50629 , 52839 , 60384 , 74934 , 74934-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR940711 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/12/2010 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/04/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-05573 | |
03/04/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-07111 | |
05/04/2009 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Appointment of Counsel. | 09-11015 | |
06/24/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. | 09-15689 | |
06/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/23/2009 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | 09-18063 | |
07/24/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Received Proper Person Notice. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Notice to the Court. | 09-18192 | |
07/24/2009 | Brief | Received Proper Person Brief. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Appellant's Opening Brief. | 09-18194 | |
08/31/2009 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Suspension of Rules. | 09-21189 | |
09/02/2009 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Motion for Leave to File Motion for Suspension of Rules. | 09-21376 | |
09/02/2009 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Motion for Leave to Have Motion for Appointment of Counsel on Appeal Filed and Submitted. | 09-21395 | |
10/01/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Inquiring why submitted documents have been received and not filed. | 09-23958 | |
10/16/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Received Proper Person Letter. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). | 09-25256 | |
11/25/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Received Proper Person Notice. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 04/07/10). Certificate of Mailing - Motion for Appointment of Counsel. | 09-28864 | |
04/07/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Temporary Remand. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 35 days. fn2[This court directs the clerk of this court to return unfiled the proper person documents received in this matter.] | 10-09046 | |
04/19/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 15, 2010 referring the matter to Robert Bell, Esq. for the selection of counsel for petitioner. | 10-10233 | |
05/06/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 5/5/10 appointing Aziz Merchant, Esq. as counsel for appellant. | 10-11700 | |
05/06/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 20 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 10-11729 | |
05/17/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-12744 | |
05/24/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-13499 | |
08/31/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief | 10-22399 | |
08/31/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 1. | 10-22400 | |
08/31/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 2. | 10-22403 | |
09/27/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-24697 | |
10/12/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-26669 | |
10/12/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/09/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-13630 | |
06/03/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-16351 | |
06/03/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
06/10/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 7, 2011. | 11-16351 |