judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

V & R CONSTRUCTION CONSULTANTS VS. WDF, INC.

Case Information: 53379
Short Caption:V & R CONSTRUCTION CONSULTANTS VS. WDF, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A568583Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/10/2009 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/09/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
03/09/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-05898
03/09/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 09-05899
03/10/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt 09-06097
03/13/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $74.00 from Peter B. Mortenson - check no. 1608.
03/13/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $176.00 from Peter B. Mortenson - check no. 4055.
03/23/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-07237
04/02/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/14/09 09-08321
05/06/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 09-11264
05/06/2009MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement 09-11265
05/08/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH 09-11457
05/08/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.