judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, DEPT. OF MOTOR VEHICLES VS. JOSEPH

Case Information: 53380
Short Caption:STATE, DEPT. OF MOTOR VEHICLES VS. JOSEPHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A566815Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/12/2009 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/17/2010 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/17/2010How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/09/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/09/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-05902
03/12/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. 09-06328
03/24/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/20/09 09-07389
03/24/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The attorneys wish to have this case consolidated with Case No. 53248 so that they can do one set of briefs for both cases. 09-07391
03/26/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-07634
04/13/2009Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Fn1[settlement judge indicates the parties may wish to have this appeal consolidated with Docket No. 53248. If this is so, the parties should file an appropriate motion]. 09-09105
04/29/2009Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 09-10670
07/16/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-17430
07/16/2009AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 09-17432
08/10/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-19415
09/10/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-21918
09/15/2009MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Appellant has Improperly Raised New Issues in its Reply Brief and as such Must be Stricken Pursuant to NRAP 28(c). 09-22361
09/23/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Joseph's Motion to Strike. 09-23085
09/29/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Respondent's Motion for Permission to File Response to Appellant's Reply Brief. 09-23744
10/06/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Joseph's "Motion for Permission to File Response." 09-24356
11/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion to Strike and Granting Motion to Supplement Answering Brief. Supplemental Answering Brief due: 15 days. Appellant shall have ten days from the date appellant's supplemental brief is served to file and serve any reply to that document. fn1[Although appellant opposes respondent's motion for leave to file a reply, we have considered the reply and grant the motion. The clerk of this court shall file respondent's reply, which was provisionally received in this court on September 25, 2009.] 09-27203
11/06/2009MotionFiled Reply to Response. 09-23418
11/16/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Supplement to Her Answering Brief Regarding Appellant's NRS 51.075 (1) Hearsay Argument. 09-27856
11/25/2009BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Supplement. 09-28798
04/28/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 17, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. SNP10-JH/MD/KP 10-10893
06/01/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 10-14105
06/17/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/07/2010Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions (Docket No. 53248); affirmed (Docket No. 53380)." Before Hardesty/Douglas/Pickering, JJ. Author: Hardesty, James. We concur: Douglas/Pickering. 126 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 38. SNP 10-JH/MD/KP 10-26096
11/01/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-28473
11/01/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/17/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 9, 2010. 10-28473