Case Information: 55164 | |||
Short Caption: | ROMERO VS. SPARKS POLICE DEPT. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0901183 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/12/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/30/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-31547 | |
01/12/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-00949 | |
03/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to Properly Serve his Notice of Appeal and Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement and Directing Transmission of Record. Appellant's proof of service due: 15 days. Record on Appeal due: 3 days. | 10-07672 | |
03/31/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Reply to Order Directing Appellant to Properly Serve his Notice of Appeal and Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement Purausnt to NRAP 25 (b) - (d) and Motion for Expansion of Time to Comply with Order and Request for Copies of Notice of Apeal and Appeal Statement as this Court has the only copies of the Said Documents. | 10-08371 | |
04/09/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Copies. The clerk of this court shall provide appellant with two copies each of his notice of appeal and civil proper person appeal statement, so that he may retain one copy for his records and serve one copy on respondent's counsel. Appellant's Certificate of Service due: 30 days. fn1[Because the Sparks City Attorney is respondent's counsel of record, appellant's contention that the Sparks City Attorney is not the proper individual to be served is rejected.] | 10-09361 | |
04/12/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols 1-3. | 10-09532 | |
04/12/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/16/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Certificate of Service - Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement and Notice of Appeal. | 10-10023 | |
03/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Response. Respondent's Response to the Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement (10 pages) due: 30 days. | 11-07552 | |
03/23/2011 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Response in Opposition. | 11-08875 | |
03/23/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Response in Opposition. | 11-08876 | |
03/29/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Sparks City Attorneys office explaining that they were unable to serve a copy of their response upon appellant. | 11-09505 | |
04/06/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have ten days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abanoned. | 11-10237 | |
05/11/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 11-13970 | |
06/09/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-17090 | |
06/09/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
06/16/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 14, 2011. | 11-17090 |