judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROMERO (ITAMAR) VS. NEV. BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RS

Case Information: 55166
Short Caption:ROMERO (ITAMAR) VS. NEV. BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 55167
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI080661Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/01/2010How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/30/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/30/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-31572
01/05/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Troy C. Jordan, Deputy Attorney General. 10-00207
01/27/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 10-02241
02/01/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 10-02767
02/01/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/08/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Administratively Closing Appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close the appeal in Docket No. 55167 and transfer to Docket No. 55166 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 55167. Nos. 55166/55167. 10-03467
02/08/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 55167 PER ORDER 02/08/10). 10-03472
06/09/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG fn2[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 10-14816
07/22/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 10-18910
08/16/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-19378
08/16/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/20/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 17, 2010. 10-19378