Case Information: 53370 | |||
Short Caption: | GONSKI VS. PN II, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53414 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0803125 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/10/2009 / Cashill, Wm. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/05/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Nancy Avanzino-Gilbert check no. 1908. | ||
03/05/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-05671 | |
03/10/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Wm. Patterson Cashill | 09-06040 | |
03/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 09-07418 | |
03/24/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 09-07419 | |
03/25/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. Appellants intend to withdraw or dismiss this appeal and proceed with the Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on 3/12/09. No further action is required from settlement jduge. | 09-07556 | |
03/26/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal Served on Settlement Judge. | 09-07649 | |
03/30/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- PANEL-TH | 09-07848 | |
03/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |