Case Information: 53369 | |||
Short Caption: | RUBIN VS. SANTORO DRIGGS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53261 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A531581 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/05/2009 / Saint-Aubin, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/05/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/05/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-05577 | |
03/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-05578 | |
03/05/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin | 09-05608 | |
03/11/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. Nos. 53261/53369-cases are not consolidated. | 09-06208 | |
03/13/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bob Porter - check no. 4803. | ||
03/17/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-06693 | |
03/24/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 09-07375 | |
04/13/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 5/8/09 | 09-09204 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are continuing to hold discussions on resolution. | 09-13146 | |
09/03/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 09-21443 | |
09/09/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge requests extension of time for Final Status Report to 10/13/09. | 09-21866 | |
10/28/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Settlement Judge to file final status report by 11/30/09 | 09-26497 | |
12/10/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 09-29987 | |
12/16/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-30536 | |
12/22/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 09-30937 | |
01/14/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 10-01170 | |
01/29/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-02521 | |
03/22/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Due date: 5 days. | 10-07518 | |
03/23/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant/Defendant's Motion for Procedural Order. (35) days. | 10-07609 | |
03/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 26, 2010. | 10-08287 | |
04/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-10512 | |
05/05/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file opening brief. Due: 5/11/10. | 10-11594 | |
05/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-12254 | |
05/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Vacate Judgment Being Appealed from and Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal | 10-13567 | |
06/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Disapproving Stipulation. To the extent that the parties request that this court vacate the district court's order awarding attorney fees and costs, the stipulation is disapproved. Response due: 10 days. Fn1 [In light of this order, we defer ruling on appellant's May 11, 2010, motion for extension of time to file the opening brief.] | 10-14447 | |
06/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Disapproving Stipulation, Filed June 4, 2010. | 10-15197 | |
07/01/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. and Remanding. The stipulation is approved, and we thus "dismiss this appeal and remand this matter to the district court for further consideration of the parties' request to vacate the attorney fees and costs order." Fn1 [This order constitutes our final disposition in this matter.] | 10-17178 | |
07/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |