Case Information: 55201 | |||
Short Caption: | QUE VS. QUE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 62159 , 63377 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D358406 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/12/2010 / Segel, M. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-00340 | |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
01/07/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-00341 | |
01/12/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel | 10-00959 | |
01/12/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Family Court Cover Sheet. (CONFIDENTIAL). | 10-00976 | |
01/19/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Parlade Law LLC - check no. 1221. | ||
01/29/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-02640 | |
02/08/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/4/10 | 10-03428 | |
03/17/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. the settlement conference is continued to 3/30/10 | 10-07118 | |
04/21/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter | 10-10378 | |
04/28/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-10917 | |
05/14/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/29/09, 10/5/09. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub/Transcript Video Services. | 10-12612 | |
05/19/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub's Notice Regarding Transcripts. | 10-13032 | |
05/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants response is served. Briefing is suspended. | 10-13391 | |
06/01/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Tammy Gonzales stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/29/09. | 10-14076 | |
06/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 10-16676 | |
07/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | 10-17441 | |
09/13/2010 | Order/Dispositional | "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 10-23472 | |
10/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-26275 | |
10/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/20/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 15, 2010. | 10-26275 |