Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/06/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Day R. Williams check no. 2948. | | |
01/06/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 10-00338 |
01/13/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King | | 10-01026 |
01/13/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-01076 |
01/25/2010 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Docketing statement due: February 2, 2010. | | 10-02005 |
02/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-02731 |
02/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (10) days. | | 10-02861 |
02/16/2010 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. Via E-Flex. FILED PER ORDER 3/30/10 | | |
02/23/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. Filed with attached letters. | | 10-04824 |
03/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-05552 |
03/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-05981 |
03/17/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Docket Sheet. | | 10-07138 |
03/26/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated. | | 10-08042 |
03/30/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. We grant appellants' motion for an extension to file the docketing statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received 2/16/10. Both parties and settlement judge have noted two appellants have filed bankruptcy petitions. Appellants have 15 days to file a status report informing this court whether this appeal is affected by bankruptcy proceedings. Appellants: Status Report due: 15 days;Transcript request due: 15 days; Opening brief due: 90 days. | | 10-08262 |
03/30/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals | | 10-08265 |
04/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-08957 |
04/12/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-09500 |
04/12/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/16/09, 11/17/09, 11/18/09, and 11/19/09. To Court Reporters: Kathy Jackson/Carrie Hewerdine (Capitol Reporters). (Respondents' Transcript Request (NRAP 9)). | | 10-09548 |
04/13/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. Appellant's Status Report. | | 10-09565 |
04/13/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Appellant's Transcript Request. Transcripts requested: 11/17/09, 11/18/09, and 11/19/09. To Court Reporter: K. Jackson and C. Hewerdine. | | 10-09567 |
04/13/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Capitol Reporters regarding payment for transcripts. | | 10-09688 |
04/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated. | | 10-10504 |
04/28/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-10919 |
04/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and for Sanctions for Failure of Appellants to Comply with NRAP 9 | | 10-11117 |
04/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal as to Appellants High Rock Holding, LLC and Granite Investment Group, LLC and for Sanctions | | 10-11118 |
04/30/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated docket sheet. | | 10-11155 |
05/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss High Rock and Granite. | | 10-11784 |
05/07/2010 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Exhibit 1A-1E. To Oppsoition to Motion to Dismiss High Rock and Granite. | | 10-11804 |
05/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal and for Failure of Appellants to Comply with NRAP 9 | | 10-11875 |
05/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Respondents' Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal and for Sanctions for Failure of Appealltns to Comply with NRAP 9. | | 10-12206 |
05/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Respondents' Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal as to Appellants High Rock Holding LLC and Granite Investment Group, LLC and for Sanctions. | | 10-12207 |
05/18/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated. | | 10-12871 |
06/01/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kathy Jackson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/16/09, 11/17/09, and 11/18/09. | | 10-14019 |
06/01/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Carrie Hewerdine stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/19/09. | | 10-14020 |
06/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-14248 |
06/04/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 10-14378 |
06/09/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (updated) | | 10-14808 |
06/10/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motions to Dismiss. | | 10-15034 |
06/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated. | | 10-15431 |
06/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | | 10-15467 |
06/15/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: July 28, 2010. | | 10-15469 |
06/24/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Updated Docket Sheet. | | 10-16479 |
07/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 10-18296 |
07/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. Docket Sheet. | | 10-18870 |
07/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | | 10-19495 |
07/28/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Vacation. | | 10-19496 |
07/28/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 27, 2010. | | 10-19497 |
08/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. regarding briefing schedule. Briefing suspended. Appellants: 30 days to file status report. | | 10-19848 |
08/31/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Status Report. | | 10-22362 |
09/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Appellants: 10 days to file the opening brief. briefing shall proceed as set forth inNRAP 31(a)(1). | | 10-24591 |
10/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Second Motion for Extension to File Brief. (30) days. | | 10-25854 |
10/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Appellants' Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. | | 10-26276 |
10/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Second Motion for Extension to File Brief. | | 10-26337 |
10/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix with CD-ROM included. Volumes 1-10. | | 10-26339 |
10/11/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from attorney Day Williams (via fax) confirming that no brief is required until the pending motions are ruled on. | | 10-26448 |
10/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: 30 days. | | 10-27841 |
11/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Long Brief. | | 10-30729 |
11/24/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Revised Joint Appendix Index. (Includes Vol 11-13). | | 10-30730 |
12/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volume 14. | | 10-32183 |
12/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed 2nd Revised Joint Appendix Index. | | 10-32185 |
12/17/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. We direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief received on November 24, 2010. fn1[We also direct the clerk of this court to file volumes 11-1-2 of the joint appendix, which was inadvertantly received along with appellants' November 24, motion.] | | 10-32994 |
12/17/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 10-32996 |
12/17/2010 | Appendix | Filed Revised Joint Appendix with CD-ROM included. (Volumes 11-13). | | 10-32999 |
01/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Request). | | 11-00664 |
01/06/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved - Answering Brief due: February 17, 2011. | | 11-00665 |
02/17/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Appellants' Opening Brief. | | 11-05102 |
02/17/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 1. | | 11-05160 |
02/17/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 2. | | 11-05161 |
02/17/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 3. | | 11-05162 |
02/17/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 4. | | 11-05163 |
02/17/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief in Excess of Thirty (30) Pages. | | 11-05209 |
02/17/2011 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. (Received via E-Flex). FILED PER ORDER OF 2/28/11. | | |
02/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief in Excess of Thirty (30) Pages. | | 11-05380 |
02/22/2011 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief in Excess of Thirty (30) Pages. | | 11-05510 |
02/28/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to File Answering Brief with Excess Pages. The clerk of this court is directed to file the answering brief. Reply brief due 30 days. | | 11-05962 |
02/28/2011 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief RESPONDENTS' ANSWERING BRIEF | | 11-05964 |
03/31/2011 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 11-09668 |
03/31/2011 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Reply)- Volume 15. | | 11-09667 |
03/31/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
08/25/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues presented by this matter. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 11-25947 |
09/12/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for October 31, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP | | 11-27693 |
09/26/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 11-29208 |
09/30/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Consolidate. Appellants have submitted a motion to consolidate this appeal with the appeals in Docket Nos. 55981 and 56473. We direct the clerk of this court to file the motion to consolidate, which was received on November 18, 2010. The motion to consolidate is denied pursuant to NRAP 3(b)(2), as the appeals in Docket Nos. 55981 and 56473 have been dismissed and will not be reconsidered. | | 11-29859 |
09/30/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Cases. | | 11-29860 |
09/30/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel. | | 11-29883 |
10/19/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Attorney Kenneth Dale Sisco shall be allowed to appear on behalf of appellants. Attorney Day R. Williams shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Sisco in this matter. | | 11-32363 |
10/31/2011 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. | | |
10/31/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/NS | | |
03/01/2012 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before Before Saitta, C.J., Cherry and Gibbons, JJ. Author: Cherry, J. 128 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 9. NNP11. | | 12-06592 |
03/19/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. | | 12-08678 |
03/19/2012 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Day R. Williams. Check no. 4081. | | |
04/13/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers with Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 52861, 54332, 55228, 53872, 59506, 54703, 55200, 58774. (Letter entered in 52861 as document no. 12-12068.) | | |
04/27/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 12-13423 |
05/08/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Partial Remand. | | 12-14397 |
05/08/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 12-14464 |
05/14/2012 | Motion | Filed Response to Appellants' Motion for Partial Remand. | | 12-15372 |
05/17/2012 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Motion for Partial Remand. | | 12-15755 |
05/24/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Fn1[We deny appellants' motion for a partial remand on the issue of whether appellant Ronald Weddell retained his managerial interests in appellant Granite Investment Group, Inc.; however, since appellants state that time is of the essence on the management issue, we direct the clerk of this court to issue the remittitur fortwith.] | | 12-16459 |
05/24/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 12-16465 |
05/24/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
05/30/2012 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2012. | | 12-16465 |