Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/30/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 09-31596 |
12/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
01/19/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 10-01531 |
01/21/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | | 10-01756 |
01/22/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certification in Compliance With N.R.A.P. 9(a)(C) | | 10-01879 |
01/22/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Brian Addington (Federal Public Defender). | | 10-01881 |
04/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (60) days. | | 10-11034 |
04/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due: June 28, 2010. | | 10-11106 |
06/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (2nd Request). | | 10-16772 |
07/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due July 28, 2010. | | 10-17316 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1 | | 10-19528 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2 | | 10-19529 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3 | | 10-19530 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4 | | 10-19531 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5 | | 10-19532 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6 | | 10-19533 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 7 | | 10-19534 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 8 | | 10-19535 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 9 | | 10-19536 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 10 | | 10-19537 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 11 | | 10-19538 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 12 | | 10-19539 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 13 | | 10-19540 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 14 | | 10-19543 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 15 | | 10-19544 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 16 | | 10-19548 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 17 | | 10-19549 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 18 | | 10-19550 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 19 | | 10-19551 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 20 | | 10-19552 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 21 | | 10-19553 |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 22 | | 10-19554 |
07/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Opening Brief (108) pages. | | 10-19581 |
07/29/2010 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. Via E-Flex. FILED PER ORDER OF 7/30/10. | | |
07/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for leave to file an opening brief in excess of 80 pages. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on July 29, 2010. | | 10-19708 |
07/30/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief | | 10-19710 |
07/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to File Opening Brief in Excess of Page Limit. | | 10-19712 |
08/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time/Answering Brief. (60) days | | 10-22203 |
08/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion/Answering brief due October 29, 2010. | | 10-22260 |
10/28/2010 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 10-28391 |
11/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Request for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Reply Brief (first request). | | 10-30902 |
11/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: January 28, 2011. | | 10-31021 |
01/31/2011 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 11-02901 |
01/31/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted for Decision. | | |
03/28/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has submitted a proper person motion to consolidate and for substitution of counsel. We note that appellant has not sought leave to file documents in proper person in this appeal. The clerk of this court shall file the proper person doucment received on March 14, 2013. | | 13-09261 |
03/28/2013 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Supplement attached Petition for Consolidation of Cases C129540 and C124090 and Renew Motion for Substitution of Counsel. | | 13-07839 |
03/11/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We direct the clerk of this court to file the "Motion in Propria Person for Substitution-Of-Counsel or in the Alternative Waive Right to Counsel" received on January 28, 2014. We therefore deny the motion to the extent that it requests appointment of substitute counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of the motion to appellant's counsel. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to the motion to proceed without counsel, if deemed necessary. | | 14-07670 |
03/11/2014 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion in Propria Persona for Substitution of Counsel or in the Alternative Waive Right to Counsel. | | 14-02880 |
04/01/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Seal Response to Court Order Re Pro Se Motion to Proceed Without Counsel, or, in the Alternative, to Permit Counsel to Consider Whether to Withdraw Materials Proposed to be Filed Under Seal. | | 14-10186 |
04/03/2014 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Motion to Seal Response. | | 14-10600 |
04/10/2014 | Motion | Filed Reply to Opposition to Motion to Seal Response. | | 14-11512 |
05/19/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the response submitted under seal on April 9, 2014. Counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to the March 11, 2014, order, if deemed necessary. | | 14-16115 |
06/09/2014 | Motion | Filed Response to Order Re Pro Se Motion to Proceed Without Counsel. | | 14-18722 |
09/23/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We therefore deny appellant's motion to proceed in proper person in this appeal. | | 14-31611 |
02/27/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file, in proper person, rehearing en banc is denied. | | 15-06363 |
06/25/2015 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Cherry and Saitta, JJ., dissenting. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 39. EN BANC | | 15-19370 |
07/13/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to File Petition for Rehearing. | | 15-21245 |
07/22/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Petition for Rehearing due: August 3, 2015. | | 15-22168 |
08/04/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Permit Appellant to File a Petition for Rehearing in Excess of 4,667 Words. (DETACHED PETITION FOR REHEARING AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 8/13/15). | | 15-23440 |
08/13/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the petition for rehearing submitted with the motion on August 4, 2015, and file it separately in this matter. | | 15-24444 |
08/13/2015 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (DETACHED FROM MOTION FILED ON AUGUST 4, 2015, AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 8/13/15). | | 15-24445 |
10/20/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 (Letter entered in no. 55220 as document no. 15-31913) | | |
10/22/2015 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Cherry and Saitta, JJ., dissenting. | | 15-32257 |
10/27/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Stay the Remittitur. | | 15-32807 |
11/06/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion to stay issuance of the remittitur. See NRAP 41(b). We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until March 16, 2016. Id. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by March 16, 2016, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that respondent has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by March 16, 2016, the remittitur shall issue on March 17, 2016. | | 15-33967 |
01/15/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled, the proper person documents received on January 7, 2016. Appellant should address all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel, and shall proceed through counsel in the prosecution of this appeal. | | 16-01543 |
01/20/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice: The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kennedy, who on January 12, 2016, extended the time to and including March 7, 2016. | | 16-01929 |
03/16/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed March 9, 2016 and placed on the docket as Case No. 15-8499. | | 16-08305 |
05/19/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | | 16-15846 |
05/20/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 16-15907 |
05/20/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
06/10/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 27, 2016. | | 16-15907 |