judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEVADA POWER CO. VS. BECKER

Case Information: 55180
Short Caption:NEVADA POWER CO. VS. BECKERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50868
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A550071 Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:01/06/2010 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/07/2011 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/07/2011How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-31665
12/31/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
01/06/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost 10-00321
01/07/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Nevada Power Company check no. 1818.
01/19/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-01466
01/20/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) 10-01615
01/20/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. (Cross-appeal)
01/22/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John M. Netzorg check no. 15727. (Cross-Appeal)
02/11/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. 10-03751
02/11/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement (Respondents/Cross-Appellants) 10-03755
02/11/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Certificate of Service of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 10-03786
02/12/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 10-03934
02/18/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/19/10 10-04389
05/10/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 10-12146
05/11/2010Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 10-12268
05/27/2010Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents/cross-appellants' transcript request form due: June 7, 2010. 10-13791
05/28/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 10-13924
06/08/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Transcripts requested: 08/24/09, 08/25/09, and 026/09. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 10-14604
06/16/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/24/09 and 8/28/09. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. (Supplement to Request for Transcripts of Proceedings) 10-15721
07/13/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/24/09, 8/25/09, 8/26/09 and 8/28/09. 10-17978
08/11/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent 10-20727
08/11/2010AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols 1-12. 10-20729
08/12/2010AppendixReceived CD-ROM for Appendix. Joint Appendix Vols 1-12. (10-20729)
09/03/2010MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Time to File Respondents'-Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief and Opening Brief. 10-22677
09/03/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief due: September 23, 2010. 10-22678
09/22/2010MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Time to File Respondents'-Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief and Opening Brief (Second Request). 10-24370
10/21/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal received on October 1, 2010. 10-27491
10/21/2010BriefFiled Answering. Brief Respondents' Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal. 10-27492
11/22/2010BriefFiled Appellant's Combined Reply Brief and Answering Brief. 10-30508
12/27/2010MotionFiled Stipulation Extending Time to File Respondents'-Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief to Appellant's Answering Brief. 10-33696
12/27/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: January 10, 2011. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). 10-33705
01/11/2011BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Respondents' Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. 11-01021
04/11/2011OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
06/17/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the panel on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 11-18113
07/13/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 7, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City before the En Banc Court. 11-21074
08/03/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order instructing counsel to prepare to discuss specific issues during oral argument. 11-23374
08/25/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 11-26026
09/07/2011Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/27/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Fn6[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter]. 12-06117
03/15/2012Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Apellant's Petition for ReHearing. 12-08304
03/15/2012Filing FeeE-Payment $150.00 from Erich N. Storm
04/17/2012Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). 12-12332
05/14/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-15257
05/14/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
05/29/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 22, 2012. 12-15257