Case Information: 55179 | |||
Short Caption: | CROWE (SAMUEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C158825 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/31/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-31657 | |
12/31/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/31/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-31658 | |
01/06/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/17/09. To Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. | 10-00313 | |
01/14/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on 1/11/10. (submitted by Appellant counsel R. Draskovich) | 10-01172 | |
02/09/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-03594 | |
02/10/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 10-03688 | |
03/01/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-05332 | |
03/01/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 10-05333 | |
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC-MC/NS/MG | 10-14833 | |
07/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15925 | |
07/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. | 10-15925 |