Case Information: 49627 | |||
Short Caption: | MITCHELL (JIMMY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52989 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C226557 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-13080 | |
07/20/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/05/06, 12/28/06, 03/20/07, 03/29/07, 04/02/07, 05/17/07, and 06/19/07. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt and Janie Olsen. Filed in district court on: 07/16/07. | 07-15907 | |
07/23/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-16057 | |
07/25/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 10/05/06. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. | 07-16348 | |
07/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 07-16382 | |
08/10/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 12/28/06, 03/20/07, 03/29/07, 04/02/07, 05/17/07 and 06/19/07. Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. | 07-17700 | |
09/04/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-19414 | |
09/14/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement due: 20 days from the filing of the 9/6/06 transcript. | 07-20306 | |
09/17/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 09/06/06. Court Reporter: Christa Broka. Filed in district court on: 08/30/07. | 07-20432 | |
10/04/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant Mitchell's Motion for Leave to File 18-Page Fast Track Statement. | 07-21920 | |
10/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisonally submitted on October 4, 2007. | 07-22106 | |
10/08/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-21921 | |
10/08/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-21923 | |
10/25/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-23556 | |
01/23/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 08-01697 | |
02/19/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-03660 | |
02/19/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 20, 2008. | 08-03660 | |
11/20/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. To Jimmy Mitchell re: the received Motion for Counsel 11/7/08. | 08-29739 | |
12/03/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Letter to Jimmy Mitchell 11/20/08. Address updated per NDOC and remailed. | 08-30690 |