Case Information: 49629 | |||
Short Caption: | BERRY (TROY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR062044 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/15/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/15/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-13105 | |
07/13/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 04/02/07, 04/03/07, 04/04/07, and 05/18/07. Court Reporter: Molezzo Court Reporters. | 07-15219 | |
07/17/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-15580 | |
07/17/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-15582 | |
08/08/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: August 13, 2007. | 07-17463 | |
08/14/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 12 pages. | 07-17911 | |
08/14/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-17912 | |
08/14/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. State's Supplemental Appendix. | 07-17914 | |
03/06/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-05677 | |
04/01/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-07839 | |
04/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/14/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 4, 2008. | 08-07839 |