judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAVARRETTA (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53515
Short Caption:CAVARRETTA (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 46861 , 53267 , 56657 , 67298 , 67298-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C215818Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/02/2009How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/01/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-08188
04/01/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. 09-09589
04/27/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on April 17, 2009. 09-10400
06/02/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. 09-13668
06/02/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/27/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP fn1[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 09-26195
11/24/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-28335
11/24/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/09/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2009. 09-28335