Case Information: 53524 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF ROBERT WITEK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - SCR 111 - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/02/2009 | Petition/Bar | Filed Petition/Discipline. Petition pursuant to SCR 111 | 09-08297 | |
04/06/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Errata to Petition pursuant to SCR 111. | 09-08566 | |
04/20/2009 | Petition/Bar | Filed Petition. Response to Bar Counsel's Petition Pursuant to SCR 111. | 09-09830 | |
11/18/2009 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Bar Discipline Order. Order of Referral to Disciplinary Board. "We . . . refer this matter to the appropriate panel of the bar disciplinary board for determination of the appropriate discipline to be imposed. We decline to impose a temporary suspension at this time" fn1-[This order constitutes our final disposition of this matter. Should there be any further proceedings concerning Witek, they shall be docketed as a new matter.] EN BANC | 09-28108 | |
12/15/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-30015 | |
12/15/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |