Case Information: 53519 | |||
Short Caption: | JAYNES VS. HENDERSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D361686 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/06/2009 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/01/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08212 | |
04/01/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-08213 | |
04/06/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | 09-08545 | |
04/09/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright. Check no. 24036. | ||
04/13/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-09106 | |
04/13/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 09-09107 | |
04/14/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Substitution of Attorneys. Lorraine J. Mansfield as counsel for respondent. | 09-09436 | |
04/20/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 09-09769 | |
04/24/2009 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. | 09-10217 | |
04/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference | 09-10233 | |
04/24/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-10234 | |
05/11/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Non-Payment for Transcripts. | 09-11544 | |
05/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, we dismiss this appeal. In the event the district court declines to grant the requested relief, appellant may file a motion to reinstate this appeal. Fn1[In light of the dismissal of this appeal, no transcripts need be prepared. We will take no action in response to Transcript Video Services' Notice of Non-Payment for Transcripts.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-12837 | |
05/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |