Case Information: 53510 | |||
Short Caption: | KINGWOOD HOLDINGS, LP VS. FACCIANI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56389 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A552641 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/06/2009 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/31/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gonzalez firm - check no. 3198. | ||
03/31/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08118 | |
04/06/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Transmit Supplemental Order and Notice of Entry of Order. Due Date: 10 days. | 09-08529 | |
04/06/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld | 09-08595 | |
04/13/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: February 23, 2009. | 09-09182 | |
04/13/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: March 6, 2009. (Notice of Entry of Amended Supplemental Order.) | 09-09183 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 6, 2009. (Amended Supplemental Order.) | 09-09184 | |
04/17/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-09690 | |
04/24/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/4/09 | 09-10241 | |
07/08/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/17/09 | 09-16794 | |
09/03/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 9/8/09 | 09-21457 | |
10/12/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 09-24849 | |
10/19/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests an extension of 90-days to file the Final Status Report. | 09-25494 | |
10/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Extension request approved. Final Status Report Due 1/4/2010. | 09-25989 | |
01/14/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-01213 | |
01/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Transcript Request Form due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | 10-01784 | |
02/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Counsel for Appellants: Nancy Allf. | 10-02831 | |
02/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within ten days from the date that the response is served. Briefing is suspended. fn3[We defer ruling on appellants' counsel's motion to withdraw pending resolution of the perceivied jurisdictional defects in this matter.] | 10-03917 | |
03/31/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Order to Show Cause and Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $ 500 due: 15 days or Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-08428 | |
04/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 10-09263 | |
05/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed without prejudice to appellants' right to move for its reinstatement upon either the lifting of the bankruptcy stay or final resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings, if such a motion is deemed appropriate at that time. Fn2[In light of the bankruptcy stay, we do not further address any jurisdictional problem.] Fn3[Appellants' counsel's unopposed February 2, 2010, motion to withdraw as counsel is granted.] SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-11835 | |
06/01/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-12656 | |
06/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2010. | 10-12656 |