Case Information: 53523 | |||
Short Caption: | SAVANNAH VS. MARCINIAK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A530757 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/06/2009 / Tanksley, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Nevada General Insurance Co. check no. 0000063181. | ||
04/01/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08237 | |
04/06/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley | 09-08594 | |
04/29/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 09-10607 | |
05/04/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 09-11026 | |
05/11/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-11627 | |
07/22/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This appeal should be removed from the program. | 09-17907 | |
08/27/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. | 09-20912 | |
09/14/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/8/09. To Court Reporter: Sarah Winn. | 09-22204 | |
11/30/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 15, 2009. | 09-28946 | |
12/29/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 09-31437 | |
01/20/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. The parties' stipulation to voluntary dismiss this appeal is approved. "This appeal is dismissed." SNP-RP. | 10-01425 |