Case Information: 53522 | |||
Short Caption: | THE BENTLEY GROUP VS. BIG SKY RANCH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53967 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A538272 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/08/2009 / Kaufman, Jerry | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gerrard & Cox check no. 28880. | ||
04/01/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-08229 | |
04/08/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman | 09-08754 | |
04/17/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-09696 | |
04/17/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 09-09697 | |
04/24/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | 09-10199 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/12/09. | 09-13167 | |
06/15/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. 53522 and 53967. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-14828 | |
07/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for the Consolidation of Supreme Court Case No. 53522 and 53967. Nos. 53522/53967. | 09-17448 | |
08/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Consolidation. Consolidate Appeals and Reinstate Briefing. Appellant Bentley: 15 days for transcripts; 90 days for single opening brief for appeal and cross-appeal. Appellant Big Sky: 30 days from opening brief for combined answering brief to Bentley's appeal & cross-appeal and opening brief on its appeal. Bentley: 30 days from Big Sky's combined brief for combined reply brief on its appeal and cross-appeal and answering brief to Big Sky appeal. Big Sky: 30 days from Bentley's combined brief for reply brief if necessary. 53522/53967 | 09-20949 | |
09/11/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/13/09. To Court Reporter: Jill Jacoby. Nos. 53522/53967. | 09-22142 | |
10/13/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Jacoby stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/13/09. Nos. 53522/53967. | 09-24927 | |
11/10/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Extend Time in Which to File Opening Brief (120) days and Concurrent Motion to Withdraw. Nos. 53522/53967. | 09-27480 | |
11/20/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Response to Moton to Extend Time in Which to File Opening Brief and Concurrent Motion to Withdraw. Nos. 53522/53967. | 09-28291 | |
12/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdraw and Suspending Briefing Schedule. We grant the motion and direct the clerk of this court to remove Gerrard Cox & Larson as counsel for The Bentley Group. The Bentley Group shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to obtain substitute counsel and to cause counsel to enter an appearance in this court. We suspend briefing in this matter, pending The Bentley Group's retention of substitute counsel. On The Bentley Group's retention of new counsel, this court will establish a revised briefing schedule. In light of this order, we deny as moot the motion for an extension of time for The Bentley Group to file its opening brief. Nos. 53522/53967. | 09-29546 | |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. in Docket No. 53522 and Cross-Appeal in Docket No. 53967 and Reinstating Briefing. The Bentley Group's appeal in Docket No. 53522 and cross-appeal in Docket No. 53967 are dismissed. Big Sky Ranch, LLC shall file its opening brief on appeal and its appendix within 30 days from the date of this order. Because The Bentley Group cannot represent itself in Big Sky Ranch's appeal, upon the filing of Big Sky Ranch's opening brief and appendix, this matter shall be submitted on the opening brief and appendix. Fn1 [In light of this order, the clerk of this court shall amend the caption in these matters to reflect the dismissal of The Bentley Group's appeal and cross-appeal.]NNP10-MC/NS/MG. Nos. 53522/53967. | 10-03298 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04188 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04188 |