Case Information: 53501 | |||
Short Caption: | HARKINS (JERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR04P0545 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/11/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/30/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-07967 | |
03/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Due 30 days. | 09-08550 | |
04/17/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment. Notice of Entry attached. | 09-09723 | |
05/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Temporary Remand. District Court Order Appointing Counsel due: 35 days. | 09-11109 | |
06/05/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 6/1/09 appointing Mary Lou Wilson as counsel for appellant. | 09-14176 | |
06/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Representing Appellant Mary Lou Wilson. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. | 09-14177 | |
06/19/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Appellant's Request for Evidentiary Hearing Transcript in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief in the Denial of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post Conviction). Transcripts requested: 4/3/09. To Court Reporter: Molezzo Reporters. | 09-15297 | |
06/22/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-15410 | |
09/28/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Request for transcripts, voire dire, including all challenges. Transcripts requested: 1/17/05, 1/18/05. To Court Reporter: Molezzo Reporters. | 09-23649 | |
09/28/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-23698 | |
09/28/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file opening brief is approved. Due date: November 2, 2009. | 09-23697 | |
10/22/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-25856 | |
10/22/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 6. | 09-25857 | |
11/19/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-28244 | |
12/11/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-29991 | |
12/11/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14902 | |
07/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16529 | |
07/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/26/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 14, 2010. | 10-16529 |