Case Information: 49621 | |||
Short Caption: | DAVIS (JERRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 50944 , 51505 , 52112 , 52794 , 54948 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR6404 Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR6532 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-13049 | |
06/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-13050 | |
06/27/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 07-14059 | |
07/24/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-16203 | |
07/24/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-16204 | |
08/10/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: August 20, 2007. | 07-17649 | |
08/22/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-18549 | |
08/22/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 07-18550 | |
11/16/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Because appellant is represented by counsel in this matter, we decline to grant him permission to file documents in proper person in this court. Appellant shall hereafter proceed by and through counsel and shall refer all concerns regarding this appeal to counsel. Any further proper person documents submitted by appellant will not be considered by this court. | 07-24951 | |
01/10/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order for Court Appointment filed in district court on January 7, 2008. | 08-00741 | |
03/28/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-07692 | |
04/22/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-08066 | |
04/22/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/29/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 23, 2008. | 08-08066 |