judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LIKE (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53525
Short Caption:LIKE (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36254 , 41628 , 42383 , 45972
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117900 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Douglas, GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Parraguirre for Justice DouglasPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/06/2009How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-08322
04/02/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/02/2009OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
04/02/2009OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sat in district court proceedings.
04/07/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-08735
04/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 09-09580
07/06/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 8. 09-16442
07/06/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/12/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-RP/JH/KP fn1[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] 10-00953
03/09/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 10-06118
04/05/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-06810
04/05/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. 10-06810