Case Information: 53526 | |||
Short Caption: | AHLERS VS. DIST. CT. (RYLAND HOMES) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52511 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A552165 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
04/02/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-08324 | |
04/02/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-08327 | |
04/07/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach - check no. 094156. | ||
05/15/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Consolidation and to Show Cause. We consolidate the appeal and the writ petition. Appellant/petitioner Herman Ahlers, as Trustee of the Ahlers Family Trust, and appellant The Ahlers Family Trust: 20 days to show cause regarding whether this court has jurisdiction to hear an appeal from an order denying a motion to expunge a mechanic's lien. Respondent/real party in interest Ryland Homes and the other real parties in interest shall have ten days from when the Ahlers' response is served to file and serve any reply. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in Docket No. 52511 shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Fn1 [In light of this order, we deny as moot the Ahlers' April 27, 2009, motion for an extension of time to file an opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 52511. We further direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled the unsolicited answer to the petition in Docket No. 53526, that was provisionally received on April 22, 2009.] Nos. 52511/53526 (09-12176). | ||
05/15/2009 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. Ryland Homes Nevada, LLC's Answer to Petitioner' Writ of Mandamus. | 09-10053 | |
05/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Ahlers' Response to Order of Consolidation and To Show Cause. Nos. 52511/53526 (09-12983). | ||
06/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Ryland Homes Nevada, LLC's Reply to Ahlers' Response to Order of Consolidation to Show Cause. Nos. 52511/53526 (09-13738). | ||
07/30/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. Allowing Appeal in Docket No. 53526 to Proceed and Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus in Docket No. 52511. Opening brief in case no. 52511 due 60 days. "We deny the petition in Docket No. 53526." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. Nos. 52511/53526. | 09-18635 | |
08/25/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-19159 | |
08/25/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |