Case Information: 53494 | |||
Short Caption: | WEDDELL VS. AURORA INVESTMENTS, LP | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A543110 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/27/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-07810 | |
03/27/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-07813 | |
04/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Carey Street Yard LLC. Check no. 0333. | ||
06/26/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Proper Person Civil Appeal Statement. Due: 10 days. | 09-15838 | |
08/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We dismiss this appeal." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-20633 | |
09/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-21135 | |
09/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 4, 2010. | 09-21135 |