Case Information: 53490 | |||
Short Caption: | ZELLIS (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53836 , 53950 , 57668 , 59874 , 61260 , 61970 , 62728 , 63071 , 64930 , 65478 , 73342 , 73342-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C245468 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/27/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Writ of Mandamus Compelling District Court to Grant Motion to Dismiss Grand Jury Indictment. | 09-07784 | |
04/07/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 3/27/09 addressed to Michael J. Zellis. Per stamp on envelope and NDOC, Mr. Zellis is not at HDSP. No forwarding address. | 09-08741 | |
04/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-09384 | |
04/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Proceed in Proper Person and Appoint Standby Counsel and /Motion for Removal of Attorney of Record. | 09-10131 | |
04/24/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 4/14/09 addressed to Michael J. Zellis. Inmate number was incorrect on envelope. Order remailed to Mr. Zellis. | 09-10281 | |
05/12/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-10556 | |
05/12/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. On April 23, 2009, this court received a proper person motion to proceed in proper person, appoint standby counsel, and remove attorney of record. No good cause appearing, this court denies the motion. | 09-12031 | |
06/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court denies any relief requested in the May 14, 2009 notice. This matter is closed and the clerk of this court is directed to retuen, unfiled, any further doucments received in this matter. | 09-14082 |