Case Information: 53505 | |||
Short Caption: | PEREZ-SANDOVAL (PAUL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 08CR000511B | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/30/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 09-07980 | |
03/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/30/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-07987 | |
04/01/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment and Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 09-08193 | |
04/02/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 1/23/09. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. Filed in district court on: 3/27/09. | 09-08337 | |
04/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Judgment of Conviction | 09-08356 | |
04/09/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Julietta Forbes stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/23/09. | 09-08951 | |
04/10/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Fast Track Statement due 40 days. | 09-09028 | |
05/19/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 27, 2009. | 09-12361 | |
05/28/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-13282 | |
05/28/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-13283 | |
05/28/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix. | 09-13284 | |
06/01/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. (Fast Track Statement & Appendix.) | 09-13572 | |
06/18/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-15179 | |
06/18/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 09-15180 | |
09/18/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. If appellant determines that this court's review of the transcript of the videotape or the original videotape is necessary for this court's determination of the issues raised on appeal, appellant shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file either a supplemental appendix that contains a copy of the certified transcript of the videotape or file a motion in this court requesting the transmission of the original videotape. | 09-22784 | |
10/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Transmit Original Audio/Video Recording. | 09-24257 | |
10/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. District Court audio/video recording due: 20 days. | 09-24670 | |
12/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/KP/MD, Douglas, J., dissenting. | 09-30968 | |
01/11/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 10-00856 | |
02/25/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-05019 | |
03/08/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant. | 10-06010 | |
04/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. | 10-10695 | |
05/10/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Opposition to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 10-12143 | |
07/08/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC Cherry, J., dissenting. | 10-17611 | |
08/03/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits:Exhibit: District Court Audio/Video Recording this day. | 10-17963 | |
08/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/09/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 4, 2010. | 10-17963 |