Case Information: 53503 | |||
Short Caption: | ESTRADA (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47726 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C220092 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/22/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/31/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08020 | |
03/31/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-08519 | |
06/22/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. | 09-15514 | |
06/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/27/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-26198 | |
11/03/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 10/27/09 addressed to Jose Estrada. Per USPS stamp, "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward". Per NDOC web site, "INACTIVE/DSCHREL". | 09-26878 | |
11/24/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-28333 | |
11/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/09/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2009. | 09-28333 | |
12/22/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Remittitur issued 11/24/09 addressed to Jose Estrada. Per USPS stamp, "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward". Per NDOC web site, "INACTIVE/DSCHREL". | 09-30948 |