Case Information: 53504 | |||
Short Caption: | RECINOS (OBDULIO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53892 , 62550 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C222187 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/11/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/31/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08019 | |
03/31/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order. Due: 30 days. | 09-08557 | |
05/06/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 24, 2009. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. | 09-11293 | |
05/15/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. fn1[This court denies as moot the motion for appointment of counsel.] | 09-12078 | |
06/30/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. District Court Minute Order Appointing Marty Hart as Counsel for Appellant. | 09-16100 | |
06/30/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 09-16108 | |
07/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Docketing Statement and Transcript Request Form due: 10 days. | 09-18557 | |
08/10/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-19398 | |
08/10/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/27/09. To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 09-19399 | |
11/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-27261 | |
11/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 28, 2009. | 09-27334 | |
11/30/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-28991 | |
11/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. | 09-28995 | |
11/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2 | 09-28996 | |
11/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3 | 09-28997 | |
12/29/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-31435 | |
12/29/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 09-31448 | |
02/11/2010 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
02/11/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/15/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. | 10-18202 | |
08/09/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19245 | |
08/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 12, 2010. | 10-19245 |