judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IRSFELD VS. DIST. CT. (ALLEN) C/W 53595

Case Information: 53487
Short Caption:IRSFELD VS. DIST. CT. (ALLEN) C/W 53595Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:53487*, 53595 Related Case(s): 53595
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A547636Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/05/2010 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/05/2010How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Alverson Taylor Mortensen & Sanders check no. 82194.
03/27/2009Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus Reversing the Orders of the District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Termination of Dispositions of Hannah Irsfeld & Jack Brebbia; Denying Hannah Irsfeld & Irsfeld & Associates' Motion for Clarification and/or Stay on Depositions of the Irsfeld Firm's Employees; Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Hannah C. Irsfeld and John C. Brebbia to Respond to Deposition Questions and Denying Hannah Irsfeld & Irsfeld & Associates' Motion for Reconsideration. 09-07726
03/27/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending a Decision on Hannah Irsfeld and Irsfeld & Associates' Writ of Mandamus. 09-07727
03/27/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 1. 09-07730
03/27/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 2. 09-07731
03/27/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 3. 09-07732
03/27/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. Volume 4. 09-07733
03/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Temporary Stay and Directing Answer. Answer due: 20 days. 09-07972
04/15/2009MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Peitioners Hannah Irsfeld, Esq. and Irsfeld & Associates, and to Respond to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Motion to Consolidate filed by Petitioner John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-09457
04/20/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Writ Petitions, Granting Temporary Stay, Directing Answer, and Granting in Part Motions for an Extension of Time. Real parties in interest shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a joint answer to the writ petitions. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-09786
05/21/2009Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano de Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings, Inc.'s Consolidated Answering Brief to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed by Petitioners Hannah Irsfeld, Esq. and Irsfeld & Associates, and Answering Brief to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Prohibition Filed by Petitioner John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-12649). 09-12649
05/21/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Answer to Writ Petition. Vol. 1. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-12658). 09-12658
05/21/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Answer to Writ Petition. Vol. 2. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-12659). 09-12659
05/21/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Answer to Writ Petition. Vol. 3. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-12661). 09-12661
05/21/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Answer to Writ Petition. Vol. 4. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-12662). 09-12662
05/21/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix to Answer to Writ Petition. Vol. 5. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-12663) 09-12663
05/27/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement or Extension of Time, Pursuant to NRAP 26 and 27, to Respond to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed by Petitioners Hannah Irsfeld, Esq. and Irsfeld & Associates, and to Respond to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Motion to Consolidate Filed by John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-13096). 09-13096
06/02/2009MotionFiled Response to Motion. Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano de Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Enlargement or Extension of Time, Pursuant to NRAP 26 and 27, to Respond to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioners Hannah Irsfeld, Esq., and Irsfeld & Associates, and Answering Brief to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Prohibition filed by Petitioner John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-13670
06/23/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Stay and Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. We direct the clerk of this court to file Allen's answer and appendix. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-15547
06/23/2009Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest Donald V. Allen's Consolidated Answering Brief to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed by Petitioners Hannah Irsfeld, Esq. and Irsfeld & Associates, and to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Prohibition Filed by Petitioner John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-14273
06/23/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Real Party in Interest Donald V. Allen's Appendix to Consolidated Answering Brief. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-14274
07/13/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano de Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings, Inc.'s Motion for Permission to File Response to Answering Brief of Donald V. Allen to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioners Hannah Irsfeld, Esq. and Irsfeld & Associates, and Answering Brief to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative , Petition for Writ of Prohibition filed by Petitioner John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595 09-17140
07/22/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioners' Hannah Irsfeld and Irsfeld Associates' Motion for Permission to File Response to Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano De Dios, S.A., Christ Chant and Orphalese Holdings Inc.'s Consolidated Answering Brief to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed by Hannah Irsfeld, Esq. and Jack Brebbia, Esq. and For Permission to File Response to Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano De Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings Inc.'s Response to Donald Allen's Answer Brief. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-17900). 09-17900
08/07/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Petitioner, John H. Brebbia's Joinder to Petitioners', Hannah Irsfeld and Irsfeld & Associates', Motion for Permission to File Response to Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano De Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings Inc's Consolidated Answering Brief to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed by Hannah Irsfeld, Esq. and Jack Brebbia, Esq. and For Permission to File Response to Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano De Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings Inc's Response to Donald Allen's Answer Brief. Nos. 53487/53595 (09-19282). 09-19282
08/07/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motions to File Responses. Real parties in interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano de Dios, S.A., Chris Chant, and Orphalese Holdings, Inc., shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve their response to Donald Allen's answer. Petitioners Hannah Irsfeld and Irsfeld & Associates shall have 20 days from the date the response is served to file and serve their response. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-19344
08/24/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Donald V. Allen's Consolidated Answering Brief to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioners Hannach Irsfeld, Esq. and Irsfeld & Associates, and Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternatvie, Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Motion to Consolidate Filed by Petitioner John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595. (09-20497) 09-20497
08/24/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion to File a Response. Brebbia's response due 20 days from the date that the answer served. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-20526
09/08/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. We direct the clerk of this court to file the response received on August 31, 2009. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-21697
09/08/2009Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partners, David Robb, Oceano de Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings, Inc.'s Response to Answernig Brief of Donald V. Allen to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioners Hannah Irsfeld, Esq. and Irsfeld & Associates, and Answering Brief to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Prohibition Filed by Petitioner John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595 09-21228
09/18/2009Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioner, John H. Brebbia's Reply in Support of the Petitions for Writ of Mandamus Filed by Hannah Irsfeld and John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-22709
09/18/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioner John H. Brebbia's Appendix to Reply in Support of the Petitions for Writ of Mandamus filed by Hannah Irsfeld and John H. Brebbia. Nos. 53487/53595 09-22711
09/18/2009Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioners', Hannah Irsfeld and Irsfeld & Associates', Response to Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partmers, David Robb, Oceano de Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings Inc,'s Response to Answering Brief of Donald Allen. Nos. 53487/53595 09-22801
09/18/2009AppendixFiled Appendix. Petitioners' Appendix for Hannah Irsfeld and Irsfeld & Associates', Response to Real Parties in Interest Frontier Partmers, David Robb, Oceano de Dios, S.A., Chris Chant and Orphalese Holdings Inc,'s Response to Answering Brief of Donald Allen. Nos. 53487/53595 09-22802
11/17/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is hereby scheduled before the en banc court on January 5, 2010, at the hour of 10:00 a.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 53487/53595. 09-28016
11/17/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on January 5, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. (En Banc) Nos. 53487/53595. 09-28045
01/05/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court.
03/03/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Joint Notice of Trial Setting. Nos. 53487/53595. 10-05572
03/17/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. and Denying in Part Petitions for Writs of Mandamus. "We deny the writs of mandamus or prohibition in both Docket No. 53487 and Docket No. 53595. . . we grant the peititon for a writ of mandamus in Docket No. 53487." Nos. 53487/53595. 10-07099
03/17/2010WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Nathan D. Severson for service upon Judge Mark R. Denton. Nos. 53487/53595. 10-07114
03/29/2010WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Mark R. Denton on March 24, 2010. Nos. 53487/53595 (10-07114). 10-07114
04/12/2010RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 10-07758
04/12/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.