Case Information: 53486 | |||
Short Caption: | CINQUE (JAMAA) VS. STATE C/W 53474 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 53474 *, 53486 | Related Case(s): | 42123 , 46012 , 46683 , 47885 , 50487 , 53656 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030888 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-07706 | |
03/27/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG Nos. 53474/53486. | 09-09370 | |
05/12/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-10585 | |
05/12/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 13, 2009. | 09-10585 |