judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

A&E HOLDINGS VS. PROJECT DISBURSEMENT GROUP C/W 53325

Case Information: 53507
Short Caption:A&E HOLDINGS VS. PROJECT DISBURSEMENT GROUP C/W 53325Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 53325 *, 53507Related Case(s): 43327 , 52302 , 53325
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A464005Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/31/2009 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/31/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
03/31/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-08060
03/31/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 09-08061
03/31/2009OtherDisqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings.
03/31/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel 09-08072
04/08/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lee, Hernandez, Kelsey, Brroks, Garofalo & Blake. Check no. 21125.
04/10/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 09-09037
04/16/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-09531
04/17/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is set for 5/26/09 09-09744
05/12/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 09-11773
05/29/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 09-13418
07/22/2009Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. and Consolidating Appeals. 53325/53507. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix.
08/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why these appeals should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents' reply due: 10 days thereafter. The requesting of transcripts and the briefing schedule in these appeals shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 53325/53507 [09-19738]
09/24/2009MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 53325/53507 (09-23235).
10/14/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Appellants A&E Holdings Et Al's Motion for Leave to File a Sur Reply to Respondent Project Disbursement Group, Inc.'s Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 53325/53507. (09-25056)
10/14/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service - Appellants A&E Holdings Et Al's Motion for Leave to File a Sur Reply to Respondent Project Disbursement Group, Inc.'s Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 53325/53507.
11/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. fn1[We defer ruling on appellants' motion to file a surreply, and we defer addressing respondent's arguments regarding fees and costs, pending appellants' response to this order and resopndent's reply, if any.] Nos. 53325/53507 (09-27201).
11/23/2009MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response. Nos. 53325/53507 (09-28609).
01/08/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Stipulation to Voluntarily Dismiss these Appeals due: 30 days. Nos. 53325/53507 (10-00675).
01/15/2010MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Appellants' Dismissal of Appeal with Prejudice Pursuant to NRAP 16. Nos. 53507/53325. 10-01380
01/19/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service-Stipulation to Appellants' Dismissal of Appeal with Prejudice Pursuant to NRAP 16. Nos. 53507/53325. 10-01437
01/22/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The parties have stipulated to voluntarily dismiss these appeals pursuant to NRAP 16, with the parties to pay their own fees and costs. "These appeals are dismissed." SNP-RP Nos. 53325/53507. 10-01912
01/22/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.