judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

APARICIO (HUGO) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 49624
Short Caption:APARICIO (HUGO) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43014 , 46316 , 49296 , 49335 , 49625 , 49712 , 52120 , 52364
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C193712Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/14/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/14/2007Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 07-13068
07/23/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. 07-15991
07/30/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. 07-16686
08/24/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-18773
09/18/2007RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 07-19064
09/18/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.