Case Information: 53488 | |||
Short Caption: | TEEGARDEN VS. DIST. CT. (HALLOCK) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A565292 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert D. Vannah, Chartered check no. 88688. | ||
03/27/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or, in the Alternative, Prohibition. | 09-07736 | |
03/27/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 09-07737 | |
04/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. | 09-10004 | |
05/29/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Specially Appearing Real Party in Interest Tamara Hallock's Answer and Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Prohibition. | 09-13362 | |
07/31/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DRIECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS." | 09-18736 | |
07/31/2009 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Michael R. Vannah for service upon Judge Kathleen E. Delaney. | 09-18749 | |
08/06/2009 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Kathleen E. Delaney on 8/3/09. | 09-18749 | |
08/25/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-19193 | |
08/25/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |