judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRUZ (JOE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53483
Short Caption:CRUZ (JOE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49247
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C219864 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/23/2009How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-07684
03/27/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 09-08518
06/23/2009Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-2. 09-15558
06/23/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/15/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2 [ . . .We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP10-JH/MD/KP. 10-18212
08/09/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-19243
08/09/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/17/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 12, 2010. 10-19243