Case Information: 49620 | |||
Short Caption: | ASTOR, JR. (JAMES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 06CR0123 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-13010 | |
06/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Mark Gibbons (District Judge Michael P. Gibbons.) | 07-13011 | |
06/14/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/8/07. Court Reporter: Carrie Hewerdine. Filed in district court on: June 7, 2007. | 07-13073 | |
06/19/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 03/08/07. Court Reporter: Carrie Hewerdine. | 07-13397 | |
07/16/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-15436 | |
07/16/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 07-15437 | |
08/03/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-17146 | |
01/30/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-02351 | |
02/26/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-04297 | |
02/26/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/29/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2008 | 08-04297 |