Case Information: 53520 | |||
Short Caption: | ANSELMO VS. NEV. BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 08EW000711B | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/09/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/01/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08221 | |
04/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 09-09572 | |
07/09/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-16943 | |
07/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-00515 | |
01/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Troy Curtis Jordan, Deputy Attorney General. | 10-01518 | |
02/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-02286 | |
02/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/05/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 3, 2010. | 10-02286 |