judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEPLEY VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 53508
Short Caption:LEPLEY VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 49277 , 52680
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI040435Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/31/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/31/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-08057
04/21/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG 09-09975
05/19/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-11542
05/19/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/21/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 20, 2009. 09-11542