Case Information: 53499 | |||
Short Caption: | ABC UNION CAB CO. VS. DIST. CT. (DELILLO) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A525606 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Hutchison & Steffen LLC check no. 5073. | ||
03/30/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. | 09-07937 | |
03/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-07938 | |
05/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. | 09-11406 | |
06/10/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (Real Parties in Interest's Answer). | 09-14487 | |
06/12/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Petitioner ABC Union Cab's Non-Opposition to Real Parties in Interest Robert Delillo and Duver O'Connor's Motion for Extension of Time. | 09-14663 | |
06/12/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Real Parties in Interest's Answer due: July 8, 2009. | 09-14668 | |
07/10/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (Real Parties in Interest) | 09-17041 | |
07/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Petitioner ABC Union Cab's Non-Opposition to Real Parties in Interest Robert Delillo and Duver O'Connor's Motion for Extension of Time. | 09-17161 | |
07/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Extending Time to File Answer. Answer due July 20, 2009. | 09-17327 | |
07/22/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. Vols. 1. | 09-17972 | |
07/22/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. Vol. 2. | 09-17974 | |
07/22/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. Vol. 3. | 09-17975 | |
07/23/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Respondent's Answer to ABC Union Cab's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-18070 | |
07/27/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Errata to Respondents' Answer to ABC's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-18262 | |
07/30/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-18644 | |
08/25/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-19158 | |
08/25/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |