Case Information: 10-CM-1170 | |||
Short Caption: | JENNIFER M. PREUSCH V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CMD8766-10 | Filed Date: | 09/14/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/14/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/06/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/06/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Jennifer M. Preusch | Y | Pro Se | N | ||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/14/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
09/28/2010 | On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Raymond Rigat, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC) | |||
09/28/2010 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Raymond Rigat, Esquire | |||
10/06/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (182pgs/Tape) 9/8/10 proc. w/CD | |||
10/06/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
10/08/2010 | STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) | |||
10/15/2010 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo) | |||
10/21/2010 | RECORD INDEX | |||
10/21/2010 | RECORD COPIES | |||
10/21/2010 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Pretrial Services report filed 5/20/10) *****SEALED | |||
10/22/2010 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
10/22/2010 | APPENDIX | |||
11/26/2010 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until December 27, 2010 | |||
12/15/2010 | On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before December 27, 2010. (By: JAC) | |||
12/27/2010 | APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE | |||
12/28/2010 | TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief - 9/8/10 RT | |||
03/14/2011 | ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli Inc., 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE**** | |||
03/14/2011 | FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED the judgment is hereby AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (jl) | |||
03/22/2011 | CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER | |||
04/06/2011 | MANDATE ISSUED |