judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DRAKE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36302
Short Caption:DRAKE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due. (01/12/01--filing fee waived per order filed today.)
06/19/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-10401
09/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real party in interest, on behalf of respondents: 20 days from the date of this order. 00-15791
09/26/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-17017
09/28/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The motion filed September 26, 2000, is granted. Real party in interest shall have to and including October 30, 2000, within which to file and serve an answer to the petition for writ of mandamus. 00-17187
10/24/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-18829
11/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. ". . . we grant this petition." The clerk of this court shall issue a writ of mandamus. fn1[We have received and considered petitioners' proper person documents. We deny as moot petitioner's proper person motion to file a reply to the answer.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20186
11/17/2000WritIssued Writ. Certified copy of writ and order mailed to Hon. Janet J. Berry, District Judge, by this office. 00-20198
11/17/2000WritFiled Writ. Served on Hon. Janet J. Berry, District Judge, by mail from this office on this day. 00-20198
01/12/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Order Denying Request for Clarification. On November 28, 2000, peititoner submitted a request for clarification of the November 17, 2000, order. We conclude that the order is sufficiently clear and deny petitioner's request. Fn1[On June 19, 2000, petitioner submitted a proper person motio for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court. The clerk of this court shall file the motion. We grant the motion for the limited purpose of waiving the filing fee for this petition. Although petitioner was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from petitioner.] 01-00793
01/12/2001MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Writ of Mandamus. 00-10403
01/30/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-00821
01/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.