judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THERESA PINA and JUAN PINA v. L. CHARLES CHRISTENSEN, M.D.

Case Heading (S-07-0295)
Case Number:S-07-0295Case Docketed On:12/21/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Professions and Occupations (Title 33)
Short Title:THERESA PINA and JUAN PINA v. L. CHARLES CHRISTENSEN, M.D.
Full Title:THERESA PINA and JUAN PINA, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. L. CHARLES CHRISTENSEN, M.D., Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTheresa PinaJames E. Fitzgerald
AppellantJuan PinaJames E. Fitzgerald
AppelleeL. Charles Christensen M.D.Scott P. Klosterman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Negligence, Trial - Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2009 WY 64
Citation:206 P.3d 1298

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/21/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/21/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/04/2008Brief - Appellants and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
03/17/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/18/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/07/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/25/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/06/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume VI, trancripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott Klosterman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James E. Fitzgerald for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/18/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (James E. Fitzgerald for appellants; Scott P. Klosterman for apppellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/18/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/13/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/03/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/1/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal