Case Information: 53498 | |||
Short Caption: | CHRISTENSEN LAW OFFICES, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (MASSI) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52976 , 53063 , 53262 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A569570 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/30/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Christensen Law check no. 16717. | ||
03/30/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-07931 | |
06/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Affidavit. Due: 5 days. | 09-14248 | |
06/15/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of Beneficially Interested Party in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus as Required by NRS 34.170. | 09-14756 | |
06/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. | 09-15444 | |
07/15/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. | 09-17395 | |
07/15/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Affidavits and Exhibits to Answer to Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-17396 | |
08/13/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. addressed to David F. Sampson returning, unfiled, the document entitled "Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus". | 09-19784 | |
03/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate its order adjudicating petitoner's attorney lien." SNP10 - JH/MD/KP clerk16 | 10-06190 | |
03/10/2010 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Thomas Christensen for service upon Judge Susan Johnson. | 10-06240 | |
03/26/2010 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Susan Johnson on March 22, 2010. | 10-06240 | |
04/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-06764 | |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |