judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. EDNA THOMPSON v. ROY THOMPSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF R. W. THOMPSON, DECEASED, ET AL., ETHEL THOMPSON CHARPIOT, ET AL.

Case: A-2776
A-2776
06/28/1950
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. EDNA THOMPSON
ROY THOMPSON, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF R. W. THOMPSON, DECEASED, ET AL., ETHEL THOMPSON CHARPIOT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/28/1951Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
02/14/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/14/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/29/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
09/27/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/16/1950Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/12/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
08/03/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/07/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
06/28/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/07/1951Response to Motion filed
02/28/1951Brief in Support of Petition
02/28/1951Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
02/14/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/14/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/31/1951Opinion issued
11/29/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
10/04/1950Document received (See Remarks)
09/27/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/16/1950Reply to Response
08/12/1950Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
08/03/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/07/1950Response to Petition
06/28/1950Document received (See Remarks)
06/28/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roy Thompson, individually and as Independent Executor of the Estate of R. W. Thompson, deceased, et al.Respondent
Ethel Thompson Charpiot, et al.Respondent
M. W. TerrellAmicus Curiae
Mrs. Edna ThompsonPetitioner
Arch DawsonAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information