Case Information: 49587 | |||
Short Caption: | THOMAS (SHAWN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55307 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR070789 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/07/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/07/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-12483 | |
06/18/2007 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 4/3/07. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. | 07-13314 | |
07/26/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's counsel Jenny Hubach; 10 days to file Fast Track Statement. | 07-16483 | |
09/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. imposing sanctions. Jenny Hubach: sanctions of $500 due 20 days. Fast Track Statement due: 10 days. | 07-21141 | |
09/27/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Ex Parte Motion for Transcripts at Public Expense. | 07-21313 | |
10/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We conclude that appellant shall proceed with his motion for transcripts in the district court and, therefore, deny the motion. Counsel for appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order in which to file the motion for transcripts at public expense in the district court. Within 5 days of obtaining a ruling on the motion for transcripts, appellant shall notify this court and the court reporter of the district court's decision. Sunshine Court Reporters shall file the requested transcripts in this court within 20 days of the district court order. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 07-22107 | |
10/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-22327 | |
10/17/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Received Notice. Copy of Order filed on 9/25/07 from the Law Library stating that sanctions in the amount of $500 had been paid from attorney Jenny Hubach - copy of check no. 3853 attached. | ||
10/23/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Fast Track Statement due: 30 days. | 07-23391 | |
12/04/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Hubach: 10 days to file fast track statement or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. | 07-26107 | |
12/07/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 07-26519 | |
12/28/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement due: 30 days. | 07-28244 | |
01/29/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-02261 | |
01/29/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-02262 | |
02/13/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-03578 | |
03/27/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-07559 | |
04/22/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-08113 | |
04/22/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/09/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 5, 2008. | 08-08113 |