Case Information: 49586 | |||
Short Caption: | BOTELHO (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43247 , 60556 , 69046 , 69046-COA , 73331 , 73593 , 75191 , 75527 , 77004 , 77004-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR032156 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/07/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/07/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-12480 | |
06/07/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/11/07. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. | 07-12481 | |
06/11/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 5/11/07. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Dotson. | 07-12648 | |
06/14/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-13041 | |
09/17/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-20477 | |
09/17/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-20478 | |
09/28/2007 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Appellants Motion for Extension of time to file Supplemental Appeal to the Nevada Supreme Court. RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 10/31/07. | 07-21474 | |
10/09/2007 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Notice of Motion and Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record and Motion and Leave to file Supplemental Appeal in Forma Pauperis/Pro-Se to Nevada Supreme Court. | 07-22239 | |
10/17/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 07-22943 | |
10/31/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We decline to grant appellant's request to remove his current counsel. Appellant shall proceed hereafter through his appointed counsel in this appeal. We decline to grant him permission to file further documents in proper person. We direct the clerk of this court to return, unfiled the proper person document received on September 28, 2007. fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to file the motion received on October 9, 2007.] | 07-23865 | |
10/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Notice of Motion and Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record and Motion and Leave to file Supplemental Appeal in Forma Pauperis/Pro-Se to Nevada Supreme Court. | 07-22239 | |
11/06/2007 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 07-24242 | |
05/16/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-12367 | |
06/10/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13110 | |
06/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/23/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 11, 2008. | 08-13110 |